U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00692
  • Case Name: White River Royalties, LLC v. Hilcorp San Juan, L.P.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Approve Settlement]
  • May 13, 2025: [Report]
  • May 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Approve Settlement]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • April 29, 2025: [Memorandum in Support]
  • April 29, 2025: [Attorney Fees]
  • April 24, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • April 23, 2025: [Report]
  • April 18, 2025: [Report]
March, 2025
  • March 12, 2025: [Report]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • November 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 07, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Order]
  • October 18, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 22, 2022: [Initial Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.