U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00700
  • Case Name: Sedillo v. Bernalillo County Metropolitan Detention Center
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 06, 2022: [Order to Show Cause]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • November 25, 2022: [Consolidate Cases]
  • November 14, 2022: [Financial Entry]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Order to Cure Defects]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.