U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00702
  • Case Name: Molina v. Jay Holding Group LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Mail Returned]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order to Show Cause]
  • January 09, 2023: [Order]
  • January 09, 2023: [Scheduling Conference]
  • January 09, 2023: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 09, 2023: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 06, 2023: [Joint Status Report (JSR)]
December, 2022
  • December 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 06, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Initial Scheduling Order]
  • November 16, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 21, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 18, 2022: [Order]
  • October 18, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • September 23, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.