U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00710
  • Case Name: Elizondo v. Social Security Administration
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Order Setting Briefing Schedule]
  • December 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • December 27, 2022: [Seal]
  • December 27, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • November 07, 2022: [Acknowledgment of Service]
October, 2022
  • October 07, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 26, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 26, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.