U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-01404-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Etsitty
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 03, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 21, 2022: [Continue]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 04, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 03, 2022: [Discovery Order]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 29, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • September 29, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
  • September 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.