U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-01639-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hernandez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Order]
  • January 19, 2023: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • January 19, 2023: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • January 09, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • December 15, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 15, 2022: [Order]
  • December 06, 2022: [Minute Order]
  • December 06, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2022
  • October 06, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.