U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00715
  • Case Name: McDaniel v. Sovereign et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Order]
  • January 17, 2023: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 17, 2023: [Status Conference]
  • January 10, 2023: [Certificate of Service]
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 12, 2022: [Minute Order]
  • December 02, 2022: [Order]
  • December 02, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • November 29, 2022: [Order]
  • November 29, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • November 29, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 18, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 17, 2022: [Joint Status Report (JSR)]
  • November 10, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Initial Scheduling Order]
  • October 06, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.