U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-00745
  • Case Name: Padilla v. Attorney General State of New Mexico
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Appoint Counsel]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Proceed 28 U.S.C. 1915]
  • December 27, 2022: [Proceed 28 U.S.C. 1915]
  • December 27, 2022: [Petition for 2254 Relief]
  • December 27, 2022: [Letter]
  • December 27, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • December 09, 2022: [Judgment]
  • December 09, 2022: [Order]
November, 2022
  • November 03, 2022: [Order to Cure Defects]
October, 2022
  • October 07, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.