U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-00744
  • Case Name: MCR Acquisition Company, LLC v. Lopez, et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 23, 2023: [Leave to File Document]
  • January 06, 2023: [Response to Motion]
December, 2022
  • December 09, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • December 09, 2022: [Declaration]
  • December 09, 2022: [Default Judgment]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 18, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • November 11, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • November 09, 2022: [Dismiss]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 24, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • October 20, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 11, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • October 07, 2022: [Jury Demand]
  • October 07, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.