U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00743
  • Case Name: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company v. United States of America et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 24, 2023: [Order on Motion to Extend (other)]
  • January 24, 2023: [Extend (other)]
  • January 12, 2023: [Answer to Complaint]
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Initial Scheduling Order]
  • December 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • December 08, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Affidavit]
  • October 11, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • October 07, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.