U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-00597
  • Case Name: Miller v. Wagner Equipment Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Order]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Initial Scheduling Order]
  • December 13, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • December 08, 2022: [Order]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Response (when not to a motion)]
  • November 22, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order to Show Cause]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • October 07, 2022: [Transmittal State Court Documents]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.