U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00742
  • Case Name: Saiz v. Social Security Administration
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • March 17, 2025: [Attorney Fees]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Order]
  • December 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • December 27, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 27, 2022: [Seal]
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 07, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 07, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.