U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00750
  • Case Name: Martinez v. United States of America et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 20, 2023: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 18, 2023: [Joint Status Report (JSR)]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order]
  • January 12, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 12, 2023: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • January 12, 2023: [Initial Scheduling Order]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Initial Scheduling Order]
  • December 20, 2022: [Initial Scheduling Order]
  • December 19, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • November 14, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • October 27, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 14, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • October 14, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • October 07, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.