U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00748
  • Case Name: Robinson v. Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Response to Motion]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 28, 2022: [Affidavit of Service]
  • December 22, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • December 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • December 19, 2022: [Judgment on the Pleadings]
  • December 19, 2022: [Stay]
  • December 19, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 14, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 08, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 01, 2022: [Stay]
  • December 01, 2022: [Dismiss]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 28, 2022: [Initial Scheduling Order]
  • November 23, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • October 13, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • October 07, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.