U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-00733
  • Case Name: Woodell v. Vivint, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 18, 2022: [Order]
  • November 17, 2022: [Stipulation]
  • November 04, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • November 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • October 25, 2022: [Transmittal State Court Documents]
  • October 18, 2022: [Order]
  • October 10, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 10, 2022: [Stay]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.