U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00754
  • Case Name: Montoya et al v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Order]
  • November 16, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • November 15, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 14, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order Adopting Joint Status Report]
  • November 11, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 10, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order Adopting Joint Status Report]
  • November 10, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • November 10, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 02, 2022: [Joint Status Report (JSR)]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • October 12, 2022: [Initial Scheduling Order]
  • October 11, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.