U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00740
  • Case Name: Soto v. Trejo et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 18, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 15, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 01, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • November 01, 2022: [Remand]
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Stay]
  • October 13, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • October 11, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.