U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-01577-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Romero et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 15, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 15, 2025: [Minute Order]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 23, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 15, 2025: [Continue]
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 19, 2023: [Continue]
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 13, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • December 09, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 09, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • December 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 09, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order]
  • December 06, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 06, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 11, 2022: [Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 12, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 11, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
  • October 11, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 11, 2022: [Discovery Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.