U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-00723
  • Case Name: Cales v. The State of New Mexico et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Letter]
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [Letter]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 19, 2025: [Compel]
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Filing Fee Received]
December, 2022
  • December 08, 2022: [Order]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 04, 2022: [Order to Cure Defects]
  • November 02, 2022: [Hearing]
  • November 02, 2022: [Appendix/Supplement]
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Letter]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.