U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00757
  • Case Name: Bennett v. BMW of North America, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order]
  • January 10, 2023: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order Adopting Joint Status Report]
  • January 05, 2023: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • January 05, 2023: [Scheduling Conference]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Joint Status Report (JSR)]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 10, 2022: [Initial Scheduling Order]
  • November 09, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 18, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 12, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • October 11, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.