U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00770-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Montano
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • December 30, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • December 27, 2022: [Minute Order]
  • December 27, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order of Competency to Stand Trial]
  • December 23, 2022: [Order of Competency to Stand Trial]
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.