U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-01660-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Guzman-Guevara
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 20, 2023: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • January 18, 2023: [Substitute Attorney]
  • January 10, 2023: [Response (when not to a motion)]
  • January 03, 2023: [Downward Adjustment]
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 12, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.