U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00761
  • Case Name: Leal v. USA
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Mail Returned]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order to Answer]
November, 2022
  • November 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • October 12, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • October 12, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 12, 2022: [Motion for 2255 Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.