U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00758
  • Case Name: Montoya et al v. The GEO Group, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 09, 2022: [Order]
  • December 09, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • December 09, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 09, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • December 08, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 22, 2022: [Joint Status Report (JSR)]
  • November 21, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • November 02, 2022: [Transmittal State Court Documents]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 31, 2022: [Minute Order]
  • October 31, 2022: [Initial Scheduling Order]
  • October 14, 2022: [Initial Scheduling Order]
  • October 12, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.