U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00763
  • Case Name: Rivas v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Suggestion of Death]
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • December 16, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • October 25, 2022: [Affidavit of Service]
  • October 14, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • October 14, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • October 13, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.