U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-01671-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hernandez-Hernandez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 07, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Order]
  • October 07, 2024: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 07, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Continue]
  • October 20, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 19, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • October 13, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.