U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00765
  • Case Name: Polanco v. Pruco Life Insurance Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Letter]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order]
  • January 11, 2023: [Judgment]
December, 2022
  • December 01, 2022: [Appendix/Supplement]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 16, 2022: [Declaration]
  • November 16, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • November 04, 2022: [Order]
  • November 02, 2022: [Remand]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Transmittal State Court Documents]
  • October 17, 2022: [Initial Scheduling Order]
  • October 13, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 13, 2022: [Declaration]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.