U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-01580-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Becker
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 10, 2022: [Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 18, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • October 14, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • October 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.