U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00774
  • Case Name: Holmes v. Centurion Correctional Healthcare of New Mexico, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Party]
  • May 14, 2025: [Dismiss Party]
January, 2025
  • January 22, 2025: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • January 23, 2023: [Order]
  • January 23, 2023: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
  • January 20, 2023: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 18, 2023: [Minute Order]
  • January 03, 2023: [Reply to Response to Motion]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 19, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 16, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 09, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 07, 2022: [Judgment on the Pleadings]
  • December 07, 2022: [Dismiss Party]
  • December 06, 2022: [Appear]
  • December 02, 2022: [Judgment on the Pleadings]
  • December 02, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Stay]
  • November 16, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order]
  • November 14, 2022: [Stay]
  • November 14, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • November 14, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 01, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 20, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • October 18, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.