U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-00773
  • Case Name: Phillips v. CCADC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 16, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 13, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
November, 2022
  • November 04, 2022: [Order to Cure Defects]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.