U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-01698-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Yuzos
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Notice of JERS Utilization]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 16, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 12, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 28, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 27, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • November 25, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 16, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • November 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • November 08, 2022: [Hearing]
  • November 07, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 02, 2022: [Response in Support]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • October 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • October 21, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 20, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • October 19, 2022: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.