U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-01667-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Faltas
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Response (when not to a motion)]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 11, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
March, 2025
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 30, 2022: [Continue]
  • November 30, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 20, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 20, 2022: [Discovery Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.