U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-01700-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brooks
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 17, 2025: [Judgment on Probation Revocation and/or Supervised Release]
March, 2025
  • March 10, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Order]
  • December 05, 2022: [CJA Appointment]
  • December 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 02, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.