U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-01509-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gutierrez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2024
  • December 17, 2024: [Response (when not to a motion)]
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 05, 2022: [Continue]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • November 07, 2022: [Discovery Order]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 24, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • October 21, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.