U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00566-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Chavez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 20, 2023: [Continue]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order]
  • January 17, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 13, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • December 15, 2022: [Dismiss/Speedy Trial]
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 14, 2022: [Continue]
  • November 08, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 26, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • October 25, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • October 21, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 21, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 21, 2022: [Oral Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.