U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:14-cr-01769-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Marmolejo
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 09, 2022: [Order]
  • November 09, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 08, 2022: [Continue]
  • November 01, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 26, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Revocation Hearing]
  • October 25, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.