U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00804
  • Case Name: Dine Citizens Against Ruining our Environment et al v. United States Bureau of Land Management et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 14, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • December 08, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 08, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
  • December 08, 2022: [Order]
  • December 08, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • December 07, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • December 07, 2022: [Intervene]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Initial Scheduling Order]
  • November 16, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 03, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • November 02, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • October 26, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 26, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.