U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-01720-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mendoza-Gonzales, et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Response (when not to a motion)]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 20, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Notice (Text Only)]
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order]
  • January 16, 2023: [Continue]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Continue]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 18, 2022: [Minute Order]
  • November 09, 2022: [Continue]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order]
  • November 04, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 03, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • November 02, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
  • November 02, 2022: [Discovery Order]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • October 31, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • October 27, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 27, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • October 27, 2022: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
  • October 27, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 27, 2022: [CJA Appointment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.