U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00807
  • Case Name: Baca v. The City of Albuquerque et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Appoint Counsel]
  • January 06, 2023: [Filing Fee Received]
December, 2022
  • December 06, 2022: [Order]
November, 2022
  • November 25, 2022: [Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 25, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order to Cure Defects]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.