U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00800
  • Case Name: Gonzales v. Li et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • December 15, 2022: [Order]
  • December 15, 2022: [Order Adopting Joint Status Report]
  • December 15, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • December 15, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Joint Status Report (JSR)]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 14, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • November 07, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 01, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • November 01, 2022: [Dismiss]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Initial Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.