U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00805
  • Case Name: Stone et al v. The Board of County Commissioners for the County of Quay et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion to Substitute Party]
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [Reply to Response to Motion]
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 19, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 13, 2022: [Leave to File Document]
  • December 05, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • December 05, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 01, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order]
  • November 21, 2022: [Sever]
  • November 21, 2022: [Remand]
  • November 21, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 14, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 04, 2022: [Jury Demand]
  • November 04, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • November 03, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.