U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-00828
  • Case Name: Nelums v. Mandu Wellness LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 19, 2022: [Response in Support of Motion]
  • December 14, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 05, 2022: [Extend (other)]
  • December 05, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Order]
  • November 09, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • November 02, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.