U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00830
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Gardner
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend (other)]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Contempt]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
January, 2023
  • January 04, 2023: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 04, 2023: [Order]
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Initial Scheduling Order]
  • December 12, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
November, 2022
  • November 09, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 02, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • November 02, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.