U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00827
  • Case Name: Lopez v. Cantex Health Care Centers II, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Response in Support of Motion]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order]
  • January 06, 2023: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 06, 2023: [Response in Support of Motion]
  • January 03, 2023: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 20, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 08, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 08, 2022: [Order]
  • December 01, 2022: [Remand to State Court]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Order]
  • November 22, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • November 22, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • November 18, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • November 18, 2022: [Order]
  • November 09, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • November 09, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • November 02, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.