U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-01722-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cruz
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2024
  • December 03, 2024: [Downward Departure]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 20, 2022: [Continue]
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • November 07, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 03, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • November 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 03, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
  • November 03, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.