U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-00837
  • Case Name: My Family Farm, LLC et al v. Board of Commissioners of Dona Ana County
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 17, 2023: [Response to Motion]
  • January 12, 2023: [Joint Status Report (JSR)]
  • January 11, 2023: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 04, 2023: [Order]
  • January 04, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 04, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 04, 2023: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • January 04, 2023: [Vacate]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Minute Order]
  • December 29, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 29, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 23, 2022: [Order]
  • December 23, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 23, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 22, 2022: [Order]
  • December 22, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 13, 2022: [Partial Summary Judgment]
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Initial Scheduling Order]
  • November 04, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • November 04, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.