U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00842
  • Case Name: Iron Horse Welding, LLC v. Beach et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Dismiss Bankruptcy Appeal]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Bankruptcy Appeal]
  • January 13, 2023: [Dismiss Bankruptcy Appeal]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order Setting Briefing Schedule]
  • January 10, 2023: [Clerk's Certificate of Service]
  • January 10, 2023: [Bankruptcy Record on Appeal]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • November 07, 2022: [Clerk's Certificate of Service]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.