U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00843
  • Case Name: United States of America v 2020 Chevrolet Silverado 2500 HD VIN: 1GC4YME77LF280234
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • January 23, 2023: [Order]
  • January 23, 2023: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • January 23, 2023: [Status Conference]
  • January 19, 2023: [Order]
  • January 19, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 19, 2023: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • January 17, 2023: [Joint Status Report (JSR)]
December, 2022
  • December 11, 2022: [Claim]
  • December 09, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 06, 2022: [Initial Scheduling Order]
  • December 01, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 01, 2022: [Claim]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 07, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.