U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-00814
  • Case Name: Saiz v. Board of County Commissioners of Dona Ana et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [Reply to Response to Motion]
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 08, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • November 15, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • November 10, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • November 07, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.