U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-00823
  • Case Name: Massey v. City of Ruidoso Downs
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 12, 2023: [Scheduling Conference]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • January 03, 2023: [Protective Order]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 23, 2022: [Joint Status Report (JSR)]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Remand to State Court]
  • November 18, 2022: [Remand to State Court]
  • November 10, 2022: [Initial Scheduling Order]
  • November 08, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.